Financial history COMMUNITY OF SAINT JOHN THE BAPTIST

Charity Number: 282448
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £1.06m £908.04k £864.14k £880.45k £1.42m
Total expenditure £559.79k £503.68k £627.89k £782.84k £799.18k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £644.44k £566.72k £658.39k £632.88k £869.37k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £185.53k £69.66k £74.69k £117.82k £381.85k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £228.36k £271.66k £131.06k £129.75k £171.23k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £552.46k £480.34k £579.19k £733.62k £731.10k
Expenditure - Raising funds £7.33k £23.34k £48.69k £49.22k £68.07k
Expenditure - Governance £3.30k £3.47k £4.20k £3.84k £4.56k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £7.33k £23.34k £48.69k £49.22k £68.07k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0