A M DOMMETT CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Gives grants to individuals, primarily students. However, as the principle trustee is currently unwell, very few grants are being distributed at the moment. Due to limited funds the charity is currently not inviting any requests for grants.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 March 2019
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 22 June 1981: Standard registration
- 09 September 2014: Removed (Does not operate)
- 09 September 2014: Re-registered
- 28 August 2020: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 28 August 2020: Funds transferred to 1092461 Sinfonia Smith Square
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/03/2015 | 05/03/2016 | 05/03/2017 | 05/03/2018 | 05/03/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £924 | £473 | £424 | £522 | £288 | |
|
Total expenditure | £500 | £250 | £3.01k | £0 | £630 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 March 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 March 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 March 2019 | 06 August 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 March 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 March 2018 | 06 August 2019 | 213 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 March 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 March 2017 | 22 February 2018 | 48 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 March 2017 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 6TH MARCH 1981
Charitable objects
THE FURTHERANCE OF EDUCATION AND RELIEF OF POVERTY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window