SALISBURY HOSPICECARE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity provides financial support for Salisbury Specialist Palliative Care Services - run by Salisbury NHS Foundation Trust - for the relief of suffering in cancer and other terminal illness and the promotion of related research. Salisbury Hospicecare Trust Ltd (Reg Ch No 1123314) began trading on 1 April 2008 and the charity's assets were transferred with Charity Commission approval.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Dorset
- Hampshire
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 21 July 1981: Standard registration
- 09 March 2019: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 09 March 2019: Funds transferred to 1123314 Salisbury Hospice Charity Limited
- SALISBURY HOSPICE (Working name)
- SALISBURY HOSPICE CARE TRUST (Previous name)
- SALISBURY HOSPICE CARE TRUST (A MACMILLAN SERVICE) (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 04 December 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 15 November 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 08 November 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 29 October 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 1ST APRIL 1981 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 30 DECEMBER 1996 AND SCHEME DATED 15 JANUARY 2009
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE ANY PERSON SUFFERING FROM CANCER OR SOME OTHER TERMINAL DISEASE AND TO PROMOTE RESEARCH INTO THE RELIEF OF SYMPTOMS ATTACHED TO THE DISEASES AND TO PUBLISH AND DISSEMINATE THE RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window