Accounts and annual returns THAMESMEAD ASSOCIATION OF PARENTS AND TEACHERS

Charity number: 282494
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 09 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 05 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 08 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 21 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 10 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required