Financial history THAMESMEAD ASSOCIATION OF PARENTS AND TEACHERS

Charity number: 282494
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £4.64k £3.23k £9.13k £8.41k £13.44k
Total expenditure £3.08k £2.43k £3.05k £17.75k £5.58k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A