Trustees RADWINTER WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity Number: 282497
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Anna Victoria Mawson Trustee 01 February 2024
None on record
Judith Rose Thompson Trustee 26 May 2021
None on record
Maria Doreen Barnes Trustee 29 May 2019
None on record
MARGARET ASHTON Trustee 31 May 2017
None on record
CHRISTINA RENATA PIPE Trustee 02 July 2013
None on record
WENDY ROWLEY Trustee
None on record