Financial history GOSPORT CORNERSTONE TRUST

Charity Number: 282517
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £30.99k £32.39k £24.13k £41.58k £25.59k
Total expenditure £29.90k £24.03k £19.57k £40.23k £26.44k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A N/A