Financial history SUTTON GREEN ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 282519
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £174 £154 £107 £1.18k £2.55k
Total expenditure £36 £133 £1.19k £2.48k £904
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A