Accounts and annual returns PRESTWOOD WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity number: 282531
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2008 11 December 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2008 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2007 12 December 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2007 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2006 06 February 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2006 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2005 13 February 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2005 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2004 01 August 2005 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2004 Not Required