THE WHELFIELD TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support of other charities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 27 February 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 07 July 1981: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN DAVID BIEBER | Chair | 12 March 1981 |
|
|
||||
JOANNA GAY BIEBER | Trustee | 12 March 1981 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 27/02/2020 | 27/02/2021 | 27/02/2022 | 27/02/2023 | 27/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.00k | £9.00k | £9.00k | £9.00k | £9.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £7.00k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 27 February 2024 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 27 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 27 February 2023 | 19 April 2024 | 114 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 27 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 27 February 2022 | 11 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 27 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 27 February 2021 | 09 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 27 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 27 February 2020 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 27 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 3RD MAY 1981
Charitable objects
TO PAY OR APPLY EITHER THE CAPITAL OR INCOME TOWARDS SUCH ONE OR MORE CHARITIES CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS OR CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN SUCH MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
FURZEFIELD FARM
FRYLAND LANE
WINEHAM
HENFIELD
BN5 9BS
- Phone:
- 01403711049
- Email:
- joey@bieberco.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window