Financial history STARKIE BENCE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 282541
Charity reporting is overdue by 91 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023
Total gross income £37.26k £39.12k £33.37k £4.13k £18.90k
Total expenditure £68.72k £39.07k £32.00k £4.14k £5.10k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A