Financial history PINEBENT LTD

Charity number: 282552
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £53.82k £46.11k £189.14k £40.05k £48.17k
Total expenditure £44.48k £116.78k £124.17k £61.71k £51.74k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A