Accounts and annual returns MIDDLE OF THE ROAD EASTBOURNE (MORE)

Charity number: 282561
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2014 27 September 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2014 15 June 2015 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2013 06 August 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2013 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2012 17 October 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2012 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2011 08 November 2012 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2011 Not Required