Governing document MIDDLE OF THE ROAD EASTBOURNE (MORE)
Charity number: 282561
Removed charity
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 5 MAY 1981 AS AMENDED 2 MARCH 1982, 20 MARCH 1984, 1 APRIL 1990, 5 AUGUST 1991, 11 MAY 1999, 26 APRIL 2005 AND 13 APRIL 2008
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF ILLNESS, SICKNESS AND SUFFERING OF PHYSICALLY HANDICAPPED PERSONS IN THE AREA OF EASTBOURNE BY BRINGING SUCH PERSONS INTO CLOSER ASSOCIATION WITH ABLED BODIED PEOPLE AND THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION OF SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
THE AREA OF EASTBOURNE
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.