THE IRENE AND HENERY HALL CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity is dormant at present, when we receive further bequeath's we will operate again. We have -ú190. 00p in the Bankl, which raises a -ú1.00p a quarter interest.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2007
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Essex
- Kent
Governance
- 07 September 1981: Standard registration
- 30 September 2008: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2004 | 31/01/2005 | 31/01/2006 | 31/01/2007 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £190 | £4 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2007 | 06 February 2008 | 68 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2006 | 12 July 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2006 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2005 | 15 November 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2005 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2004 | 06 July 2004 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2004 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 3RD JANUARY 1981
Charitable objects
TO PAY APPLY OR APPROPRIATE THE WHOLE OR ANY PART OR PARTS OF THE CAPITAL AND INCOME OF THE TRUST FUND AT ANY OBJECTS WHICH ARE FROM TIME TO TIME RECOGNISED BY LAW AS CHARITABLE PURPOSES OR OBJECTS AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION MAY THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window