Accounts and annual returns HENSTEAD VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 282569
Charity reporting is overdue by 1550 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 89 days
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 89 days
Annual return 01 April 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 455 days
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 455 days
Annual return 01 April 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 820 days
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 820 days
Annual return 01 April 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1185 days
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1185 days
Annual return 01 April 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1550 days
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1550 days