THE CUBIC STONE LODGE (NO 4720) BENEVOLENT FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
General Charitable Activities/ donations from lodge and lodge menbers
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Essex
Governance
- 21 September 1981: Standard registration
- 08 February 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2013 | 30/06/2014 | 30/06/2015 | 30/06/2016 | 30/06/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31 | £35 | £108 | £25 | £77 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.20k | £1.38k | £0 | £1.22k | £2.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2017 | 03 February 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2016 | 10 February 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2015 | 25 January 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2014 | 03 February 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2014 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 31ST MARCH 1981
Charitable objects
TO APPLY BOTH THE CAPITAL AND INCOME OF THE BENEVOLENT FUND TO OR FOR THE RELIEF OF SUCH POOR AND DISTRESSED BROTHER MASONS OR THEIR POOR AND DISTRESSED WIDOWS AND CHILDREN OR TO OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH MASONIC CHARITIES OR OTHER CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS SOCIETIES AND OBJECTS AS THE LODGE SHALL IN DULY CONSTITUTED MEETING FROM TIME TO TIME DIRECT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window