Financial history NORTH WEST KENT FAMILY HISTORY SOCIETY

Charity number: 282627
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £22.41k £16.63k £15.12k £16.93k £18.08k
Total expenditure £20.09k £13.94k £12.12k £15.06k £21.64k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A