Governing document NORTH WEST KENT FAMILY HISTORY SOCIETY

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10 APRIL 1981 AS AMENDED ON 18 APRIL 1986, 9 MAY 1992, 29TH APRIL 1995, 2 DECEMBER 1995, 12 APRIL 2003 AND 7 OCTOBER 2006 AS AMENDED ON 14 APR 2007 AS AMENDED ON 11 APR 2019 as amended on 15 Jan 2021 as amended on 14 Oct 2021 as amended on 07 Oct 2024 as amended on 07 Oct 2024
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE SOCIETY SHALL BE TO PROMOTE AND ENCOURAGE EDUCATION IN THE STUDY OF FAMILY HISTORY AND GENEALOGY IN RELATION TO NATIONAL AND LOCAL HISTORY.
Area of benefit
SOUTH EAST LONDON AND NORTH WEST KENT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.