PROVINCIAL GRAND MARK LODGE OF SURREY BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Collections from Members of the Provincial Mark Grand Lodge of Surrey
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
37 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Surrey
Governance
- 21 July 1981: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Vaughan Christopher French | Chair | 06 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
John Raymond Massey OBE | Trustee | 16 September 2024 |
|
|||||
William Agnew Caughie | Trustee | 18 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
William Raymond Barr | Trustee | 18 March 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.79k | £21.93k | £24.76k | £106.59k | £24.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.48k | £47.32k | £18.49k | £119.01k | £15.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 20 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 25 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 25 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 13 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 15 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 14 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 14 March 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 30TH APRIL 1981
Charitable objects
TO OR FOR THE RELIEF OF SUCH POOR AND DISTRESSED BROTHER FREEMASONS OR THEIR POOR AND DISTRESSED WIDOWS AND CHILDREN OR TO FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH MASONIC CHARITIES OR OTHER CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS, SOCIETIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
BUCKLEIGH HOUSE
PORTSMOUTH ROAD
MILFORD
GODALMING
GU8 5DP
- Phone:
- 01483421529
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window