ST MARTINS CHURCH, EXNING, RINGERS BELL RESTORATION FUND

Charity Number: 282703
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Exning Church Bells restorations & upkeep

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £382

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Suffolk

Governance

Registration history:
  • 03 July 1981: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sheila Price Trustee
None on record
GILLIAN WISEMAN Trustee
None on record
JONATHAN HARDY Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £43 £39 £0 £130 £0
Total expenditure £1 £0 £0 £0 £382
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 03 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 25 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 20 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 11 November 2021 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 21 March 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
14 PAGET PLACE
NEWMARKET
CB8 7DR
Phone:
01638663470
Website:

No information available