THE ELFRIDA SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supporting people with learning disabilities and/or learning difficulties (LDD) to live happy, independent lives and providing opportunities for them to have their voice heard. Key to this are our specialist advocacy, sport activities and user-led consultation and quality monitoring service offer to empower people with LDD and ensure they can access the same opportunities as everyone else.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £82,180 from 2 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Birmingham City
- Buckinghamshire
- Durham
- Leeds City
- Liverpool City
- Nottingham City
- Throughout London
Governance
- 06 July 1981: Standard registration
- ELFRIDA RATHBONE (ISLINGTON AND CAMDEN) (Previous name)
- ELFRIDA RATHBONE ISLINGTON (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Patience Anne Wilson | Chair | 25 February 2021 |
|
|||||
Victoria Helen Middleton | Trustee | 07 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alexander Leeson-Mill | Trustee | 20 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Samira Hotobah-During | Trustee | 05 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Paul James Bartram | Trustee | 05 May 2021 |
|
|||||
INARM OSBORN | Trustee | 21 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
ADRIAN BROWN | Trustee | 30 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN WALLIN | Trustee | 06 May 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £286.51k | £324.40k | £266.81k | £315.94k | £342.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £415.66k | £342.51k | £403.92k | £371.46k | £384.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £170.51k | £125.79k | £135.35k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £104.73k | £82.18k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 February 2021 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 09 February 2021 | 9 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 1ST MAY 1981 AND AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON 12TH MARCH 1990 AND 31ST DECEMBER 1996 AND BY RESOLUTION ON 17 APRIL 1997.
Charitable objects
1) TO PROMOTE AND ADVANCE THE WELFARE, EDUCATION, TRAINING AND ADVANCEMENT IN LIFE OF MENTALLY HANDICAPPED PERSONS SO AS TO ENSURE THAT SO FAR AS POSSIBLE THEY MAY DEVELOP AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY AND THAT THEIR DISABILITIES MAY BE RELIEVED. 2) TO PROVIDE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FACILITIES FOR THE RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION OF BENEFICIARIES SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR MENTAL PHYSICAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES AND IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. 3) TO RELIEVE POVERTY DISTRESS AND SICKNESS AMONG BENEFICIARIES AND THEIR FAMILIES
Area of benefit
GREATER LONDON AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
ELFRIDA SOCIETY
34 ISLINGTON PARK STREET
LONDON
N1 1PX
- Phone:
- 02073597443
- Email:
- dolly.galvis@elfrida.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window