THE NATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR COLITIS AND CROHN'S DISEASE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2006
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 06 July 1981: Standard registration
- 29 October 2008: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 29 October 2008: Funds transferred to 1117148 CROHN'S & COLITIS UK
- N A C C (Working name)
- NACC (Working name)
- THE NATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR COLITIS AND CROHN'S DISEASE OF GREAT BRITAIN AND IRELAND (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2004 | 31/12/2005 | 31/12/2006 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.55m | £2.01m | £1.85m | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.38m | £1.56m | £1.84m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2004 | 31/12/2005 | 31/12/2006 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Other assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2007 | 23 May 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2006 | 28 September 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2006 | 16 May 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2005 | 27 October 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2005 | 11 April 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2004 | 31 August 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2004 | 09 June 2005 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21ST APRIL 1981 AS AMENDED 22 APRIL 1995, 15 APRIL 2000 AND 12 APRIL 2003
Charitable objects
1) THE RELIEF OF THOSE SUFFERING FROM ULCERATIVE COLITIS, CROHN'S DISEASE OR RELATED INFLAMMATORY BOWEL DISEASES INCLUDING THE SUPPORT OF THOSE WHO CARE FOR THEM. 2) THE PROMOTION OF THE WELFARE OF THOSE SUFFERING FROM ULCERATIVE COLITIS, CROHN'S DISEASE OR RELATED INFLAMMATORY BOWEL DISEASES. 3) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND RESEARCH INTO THE CAUSES, PREVENTION, TREATMENT AND CURE OF ULCERATIVE COLITIS, CROHN'S DISEASE AND RELATED INFLAMMATORY BOWEL DISEASES AND INTO IMPROVEMENTS IN THE MANAGEMENT OF THE CONDITIONS; AND THE PUBLICATION OF THE USEFUL RESULTS OF ANY SUCH RESEARCH.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window