ECUMENICAL SOCIETY OF THE BLESSED VIRGIN MARY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Annual conference: newsletter: study days: occasional local meetings.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2020
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 30 June 1981: Standard registration
- E S B V M (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REVEREND WILLIAM MCLOUGLIN OSM | Chair |
|
|
|||||
AMANDA MARY LUSCOMBE HILL | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2016 | 31/10/2017 | 31/10/2018 | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.72k | £1.29k | £1.21k | £1.01k | £903 | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.17k | £917 | £413 | £135 | £135 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 249 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 249 days | |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 615 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 615 days | |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 980 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 980 days | |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 06 February 2022 | 159 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 06 February 2022 | 524 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28TH FEBRUARY 1981
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE STUDY AT VARIOUS LEVELS OF THE PLACE OF THE BLESSED VIRGIN MARY IN THE CHURCH UNDER CHRIST, AND OF RELATED THEOLOGICAL QUESTIONS; AND IN THE LIGHT OF SUCH STUDY TO PROMOTE ECUMENICAL DEVOTION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
PRESBYTERY
Ss PETER & PAUL
112 ENTRY HILL
COMBE DOWN
BATH
BA2 5LS
- Phone:
- 01225832096
- Email:
- GENSEC@ESBVM.COM
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window