LINDALE EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principal objects are for the promotion of the Roman Catholic religion and the advancement of education.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 21 July 1981: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GREYGARTH ASSOCIATION | Trustee | 30 May 1981 |
|
|
||||
DAWLIFFE HALL EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION | Trustee | 30 May 1981 |
|
|
||||
NETHERHALL EDUCATIONAL ASSOCIATION | Trustee | 30 May 1981 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £58.20k | £54.44k | £35.92k | £38.05k | £28.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £29.37k | £51.14k | £49.02k | £38.66k | £25.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 22 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 22 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 08 August 2024 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 08 August 2024 | 9 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 13 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 13 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 25 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 25 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 30 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 30 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 30TH MAY 1981
Charitable objects
TO PAY OR APPLY THE INCOME OF THE TRUST FUND FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSES AND IN PARTICULAR FOR THE PROMOTION OF THE ROMAN CATHOLIC RELIGION AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 ORME COURT
LONDON
W2 4RL
- Phone:
- 02072439417
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window