Trustees ROMSEY CHORAL SOCIETY
Charity number: 282827

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christine Dyne | Trustee | 24 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sonia Helen Barros D'Sa | Trustee | 24 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Clare Hogger | Trustee | 18 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jane Bull | Trustee | 29 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Hilary Mitchell | Trustee | 29 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Christine Sprott | Trustee | 28 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Chatters | Trustee | 28 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Claire Wickens | Trustee | 28 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
John Bailes | Trustee | 28 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Julia Loescher | Trustee | 16 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Andrews | Trustee | 16 October 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.