TRINITY CENTRE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The operation of a community hall in Fishermead, Milton Keynes
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £1,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Milton Keynes
Governance
- 25 August 1981: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Daniel Mahon | Trustee | 21 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Darron James Kendrick | Trustee | 17 May 2010 |
|
|||||
MARTIN RONALD PETCHEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £38.07k | £30.27k | £27.40k | £47.83k | £36.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £46.25k | £27.81k | £33.26k | £28.07k | £32.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £20.87k | N/A | N/A | £1.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 February 2023 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 03 February 2023 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 19TH MAY 1981 AS AMENDED 17TH OCTOBER 1984 AND 21ST MAY 1986
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE (A) THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF FISHERMEAD MILTON KEYNES BUCKINGHAMSHIRE AND ITS IMMEDIATE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS AND (B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION BY THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND THE METHODIST CHURCH AND THE UNITED REFORMED CHURCH BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND THE METHODIST CHURCH AND THE UNITED REFORMED CHURCH.
Area of benefit
FISHERMEAD MILTON KEYNES AND ITS IMMEDIATE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
FISHERMEAD TRINITY CENTRE
FISHERMEAD BOULEVARD
FISHERMEAD
MILTON KEYNES
MK6 2LA
- Phone:
- 01908660401
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window