Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF YOUNG ARBURY MUSIC MAKERS

Charity number: 282840
Charity reporting is up to date (56 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 25 August 2024 56 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 28 August 2023 59 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 16 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 05 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 05 November 2020 128 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required