TREASURE ISLAND PLAYGROUP ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Local based Playgroup for children of preschool age
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
Total income includes £137,296 from 1 government contract(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Hampshire
Governance
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Wendy Wing | Trustee | 21 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jodie Whiting | Trustee | 21 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Holly Yerbury | Trustee | 04 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Wren | Trustee | 04 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kasia Rychlowska | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Kimberley Fox | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £135.62k | £127.08k | £141.43k | £139.64k | £153.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £138.61k | £139.90k | £139.55k | £146.93k | £142.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £123.49k | £118.02k | N/A | £129.55k | £137.30k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £128.66k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 06 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 06 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 29 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 29 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 10 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 10 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PPA PLAYGROUP CONSTITUITION ADOPTED 29TH APRIL 1979
Charitable objects
TOADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN BELOW COMPULSORY SCHOOL AGE BY (A) PROVIDING SAFE AND SATISFYING GROUP PLAY IN WHICH PARENTS TAKE PART WHEN APPROPRIATE, (B) ENCOURAGING OTHER CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES THROUGH WHICH PARENTS MAY HELP THE CHILDREN.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Popley Fields Community Centre
Carpenters Down
Basingstoke
RG24 9AE
- Phone:
- 01256 414014
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window