Financial history UCKINGTON AND ELMSTONE HARDWICKE VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 282855
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £13.13k £22.54k £12.14k £12.04k £14.90k
Total expenditure £11.96k £4.26k £10.37k £7.90k £12.54k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £21.04k £3.97k N/A N/A