THE DISAWAY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE DISAWAY TRUST ORGANISES GROUP HOLIDAYS WITH DISABLED PEOPLE BOTH IN THIS COUNTRY AND ABROAD. WE PROVIDE EACH DISABLED PERSON WITH A HELPER UNLESS THEY WISH TO BRING THEIR OWN HELPER.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 15 July 1981: Standard registration
- 09 August 2022: Funds received from 1167188 HOLIDAY4DISABLED
- DISAWAY (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARK HAMMERSLEY | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Veronica Jayne Roose Francis | Trustee | 10 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lydia Miller | Trustee | 10 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
TRICIA NICHOLSON | Trustee | 13 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
JOSIE KIDD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
STEVE DORAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LYNNE SIMPKINS | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £43.45k | £12.43k | £18.87k | £51.39k | £25.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £39.61k | £2.36k | £23.95k | £29.14k | £30.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 26 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 26 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 02 August 2024 | 184 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 02 August 2024 | 184 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 02 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 11TH JUNE 1981
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WHO ARE SUBSTANTIALLY AND PERMANENTLY PHYSICALLY HANDICAPPED BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF RECREATION, REST AND HOLIDAYS FOR THEM, REHABILITATING THEM, FURTHERING THEIR INTEGRATION WITH ABLE BODIED PERSONS AND BY CREATING A BETTER UNDERSTANDING AMONG THE PUBLIC OF THE PROBLEMS THEY ENCOUNTER IN EVERYDAY LIFE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
11 Larchwood Close
Banstead
SM7 1HE
- Phone:
- 07930313286
- Email:
- lynnesimpkins@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
disaway.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window