FRIENDS OF WILLEN HOSPICE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fund raising for the Hospice of Our Lady and St John
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2019
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Other Finance
- Buckinghamshire
- Central Bedfordshire
- Milton Keynes
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 11 August 1981: Standard registration
- 23 December 2020: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 23 December 2020: Funds transferred to 270194 WILLEN HOSPICE
- FRIENDS OF WILLEN HOSPICE (Working name)
- THE LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF THE HOSPICE OF OUR LADY AND ST JOHN (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £56.92k | £81.78k | £67.76k | £79.60k | £55.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £60.33k | £81.78k | £65.86k | £79.60k | £55.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 19 July 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | 19 July 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 20 December 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | 20 December 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 15 February 2018 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2017
(These accounts |
15 February 2018 | 15 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 18/06/1981 AS AMENDED ON 13/02/2015
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PATIENTS AND FORMER PATIENTS OF THE HOSPICE WHO ARE SICK, CONVALESCENT, DISABLED, HANDICAPPED, INFIRM OR IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE AND, GENERALLY, TO SUPPORT THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE SAID HOSPICE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED, IN PRACTICE THE HOSPICE OF OUR LADY AND ST JOHN
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window