EYNSFORD VILLAGE SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote an interest and pride in Eynsford and its surroundings, and to encourage the co-operaton and mutual support of all business, cultural, educational, sports and other associations for the general good. To safeguard the natural beauty of the locality and to encourage the preservation of the best features of the village and the neighbourhood.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Kent
Governance
- 23 July 1981: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SALLY COSTON | Chair | 18 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
Janet Kay McCoy | Trustee | 21 March 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.83k | £272 | £1.71k | £2.54k | £4.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.97k | £2.19k | £2.13k | £1.78k | £2.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 18 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 14 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AMENDED 27TH MARCH 1981
Charitable objects
I) TO PROMOTE HIGH STANDARDS OF PLANNING AND ARCHITECTURE IN OR AFFECTING THE AREA OF BENEFIT. II) TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE GEOGRAPHY,HISTORY,NATURAL HISTORY AND ARCHITECTURE IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT. III) TO SECURE THE PRESERVATION, PROTECTION,DEVELOPMENT AND IMPROVEMENT OF FEATURES OF HISTORIC OR PUBLIC INTEREST IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
EYNSFORD
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Cottage
High Street
Eynsford
DARTFORD
DA4 0AA
- Phone:
- 01322866102
- Email:
- sally.coston@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window