THE 2 1/2 PERCENT HISTORICAL VALUE ENDOWMENT TRUST
Charity Number: 282959
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trust exists to pay or apply the income to or for the benefit of the Independent Adoption Service
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2007
Total income: £36,627
Total expenditure: £572,020
Fundraising
No information available
Trading
No information available
Trustee payments
No information available
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
- Provides Other Finance
Where the charity operates:
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
Registration history:
- 20 August 1981: Standard registration
- 17 March 2009: Removed (Voluntary removal)
Organisation type:
Other names:
- IAS (Working name)
- THE 2 1/2 % HISTORICAL VALUE ENDOWMENT TRUST (Previous name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £64.94k | £62.98k | £57.81k | £36.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £201.19k | £98.88k | £271.18k | £572.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | 31 January 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | 04 September 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 07 February 2007 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | 31 January 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 15 May 2006 | 104 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | 15 May 2006 | 104 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | 08 March 2005 | 36 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | 08 March 2005 | 36 days late |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 1 JULY 1981.
Charitable objects
TO PAY OR APPLY THE INCOME TO OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INDEPENDENT ADOPTION SOCIETY.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NATIONAL.
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window