SHERE VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Shere Village Hall operates the Shere Village and Memorial halls for the use of Shere and the neighbourhood for use for meetings, lectures, classes and other forms of recreation and leisure-time occupation with the object of improving the conditions of life for the said inhabitants
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Surrey
Governance
- 15 September 1981: Standard registration
- Shere Hall (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Keeble | Chair | 10 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Naia Edwards | Trustee | 28 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Trudie Etherington | Trustee | 21 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Claire Dobson | Trustee | 07 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
John kenneth Wells | Trustee | 25 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev Timothy Heaney | Trustee | 02 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Galloway | Trustee | 02 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Michael DODD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £59.66k | £68.89k | £61.89k | £84.79k | £122.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £30.74k | £20.86k | £40.03k | £80.64k | £278.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £8.86k | £8.39k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 03 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 03 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 06 June 2024 | 98 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 06 June 2024 | 98 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 04 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 04 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 07 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
30 April 2021
(These accounts |
07 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 08 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 08 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED AND DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 12TH JUNE 1981
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF SHERE AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS AND IN PARTICULAR FOR USE FOR MEETINGS LECTURES AND CLASSES AND OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
SHERE AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Cottage
Lower Street
Shere
GUILDFORD
GU5 9HX
- Phone:
- 01483202869
- Email:
- mikekeeble1@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window