Financial history WEST END VILLAGE HALL MANAGEMENT TRUST

Charity Number: 282968
Charity reporting is overdue by 108 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023
Total gross income £26.93k £17.91k £29.80k £22.14k £24.88k
Total expenditure £27.64k £21.66k £31.03k £22.68k £24.87k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £10.00k N/A N/A