WEST END VILLAGE HALL MANAGEMENT TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Hall is a hub for the village. Clubs using the facilities include: Indoor Bowls, Badminton, Aerobics and Keep Fit. Regular users are a pre-school club, day centre for elderly, the W.I. dancing classes and dog training. It is also hired for private events. Fund raising events are held to ensure that the facility is maintained for the benefit of the community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Surrey
Governance
- 08 July 1982: Standard registration
- WEST END VILLAGE HALL (Previous name)
- WEST END VILLAGE HALL FUND (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jack Kegge | Chair | 18 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
Peter Smith | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sharyn Hall | Trustee | 05 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Tina Barefield | Trustee | 18 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
Brenda Ord | Trustee | 18 February 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.91k | £29.80k | £22.14k | £24.88k | £25.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.66k | £31.03k | £22.68k | £24.87k | £24.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 May 2025 | 109 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 May 2025 | 109 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 August 2024 | 204 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 November 2023 | 303 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 06 April 2022 | 65 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 06 April 2022 | 65 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 01 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
LEASE DATED 30TH MARCH 1982
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL.
Area of benefit
WEST END
Contact information
- Address:
-
Tringham Hall
Benner Lane
West End
Woking
Surrey
GU24 9JP
- Phone:
- 07919050604
- Website:
-
tringham-hall-westend.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window