Financial history RIMPTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 282972
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £6.18k £1.23k £4.06k £6.20k £5.90k
Total expenditure £7.40k £2.75k £4.23k £6.28k £5.81k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A