Accounts and annual returns MAYOR OF THE BOROUGH OF HAVANT'S APPEAL FUND

Charity Number: 282981
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2024 29 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2023 28 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2022 21 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2021 23 January 2023 329 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2020 01 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Not Required