ROTARY CLUB OF WICKFORD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Rotary Club of Wickford is part of the worldwide service organisation Rotary International. It supports all RI's projects. Locally it supports various voluntary organisations such as scouts, guides, local hospices and hospitals as well as schools. It also makes donations to deserving individuals. For more information please contact on 01268 765262
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Essex
Governance
- 07 September 1981: Standard registration
- 06 March 2013: Funds received from 237957 WICKFORD WAR MEMORIAL FUND (FIRST WORLD WAR)
No other names
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopher Norman Bushell | Trustee | 18 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Mark David Williamson | Trustee | 20 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
JACK PEMBERTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BOB PLIMMER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £43.59k | £36.56k | £29.47k | £35.38k | £27.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £42.84k | £17.54k | £43.05k | £28.27k | £55.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 01 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 01 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 15 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 15 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 03 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 03 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 02 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 02 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 19 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 19 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 26TH FEBRUARY 1981
Charitable objects
1. THE RELIEF OF THE POOR AND NEEDY. 2. SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE INSTITUTION SOCIETY OR OBJECT AS THE CLUB SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DIRECT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
72 Highcliffe Close
WICKFORD
Essex
SS11 8JY
- Phone:
- 01268765262
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window