WARMINSTER MUSEUM & HISTORY SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To maintain Warminster Museum and provide monthly lectures at Warminster Library on topics relating to history.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 20 August 1981: Standard registration
- THE DEWEY MUSEUM (Working name)
- THE WARMINSTER HISTORY SOCIETY (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sidney Kenneth Blackmore | Chair | 05 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
David John Wiltshire | Trustee | 05 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Eric Vincent Peddle | Trustee | 19 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Marguerite Elizabeth Mussell | Trustee | 20 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Mary Ross-Gower | Trustee | 20 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rodger Andrew Martin Stocks FCA | Trustee | 26 January 2000 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.07k | £170 | £343 | £1.42k | £1.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.19k | £201 | £603 | £1.50k | £947 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 13 April 2024 | 107 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 13 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 21 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 08 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 06/07/1981 AS AMENDED ON 16/03/2015
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE HISTORY OF THE WARMINSTER AREA.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
PUBLIC LIBRARY
THREE HORSESHOES WALK
WARMINSTER
WILTSHIRE
BA12 9BT
- Phone:
- 01985216022
- Email:
- museum.warminster@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window