Financial history PHILIP LAIT CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 283003
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £24.58k £24.80k £24.92k £24.60k £23.26k
Total expenditure £18.21k £19.30k £20.00k £31.90k £65.13k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A