Financial history HARRIETSHAM VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 283009
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £41.48k £50.73k £38.26k £40.80k £50.38k
Total expenditure £38.95k £46.47k £46.93k £34.10k £47.83k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £16.33k £17.60k N/A £7.78k N/A