THE SCHMIDT-BODNER CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 283014
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Trustees shall hold the Trust Capital and the income thereof upon Trust to pay apply the thereof for charitable purposes as the Trustees may from time to time in the absolute discretion determine.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024

Total income: £28,084
Total expenditure: £216,401

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 03 September 1981: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
HARVEY ROSENBLATT Trustee 01 March 2010
THE SARAH CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE ROSENBLATT FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
Martin Paisner CBE MA LLM Trustee 19 August 2003
SHAARE ZEDEK UK
Received: On time
WORCESTER COLLEGE OXFORD ENDOWMENT TRUST
Received: On time
THE MARCUS MARGULIES CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE STUART YOUNG FOUNDATION
Received: On time
MORRIS LEIGH FOUNDATION
Received: On time
TRUSTEES OF THE LONDON CLINIC LIMITED
Received: On time
THE TRUST FOR THE STUDY OF SOCIAL TRAUMA AND THE CARE AND TREATMENT OF SURVIVORS
Received: On time
FRIENDS OF THE ISRAEL CANCER ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
THE MAURICE AND VIVIENNE WOHL PHILANTHROPIC FOUNDATION
Received: On time
NEW ISRAEL FUND
Received: On time
OHEL SARAH UK
Received: On time
THE LILY AND MARCUS SIEFF CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
TEALE CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE WEIZMANN INSTITUTE FOUNDATION
Received: On time
DEVONSHIRE STREET CHARITABLE FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE PETER CRUDDAS FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE DENISE COHEN CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE SIR SIGMUND STERNBERG CHARITABLE FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE SHIRLEY YOUNG CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
HADASSAH MEDICAL RELIEF ASSOCIATION U.K.
Received: On time
THE RUTH AND JACK LUNZER CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE STELLA AND ALEXANDER MARGULIES CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE SYBIL SHINE MEMORIAL TRUST
Received: On time
YONI JESNER FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE ROSENBLATT FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE AMERICAN JEWISH JOINT DISTRIBUTION COMMITTEE (UK ) TRUST
Received: On time
JANET WOLFSON DE BOTTON CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE CISSIE ROSEFIELD CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE BLUSTON CHARITABLE SETTLEMENT
Received: On time
THE POTEL CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE BARNETT AND SYLVIA SHINE NO 2 CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE ADLER TRUST
Received: On time
THE LATCHMAN FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE WOLFSON FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
DANIEL ISAAC DOVER Trustee 19 August 2003
THE BLUSTON CHARITABLE SETTLEMENT
Received: On time
THE APELT AND LAZARUS CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE MAURICE WOHL CHARITABLE FOUNDATION
Received: On time
BDO CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: 14 days late
THE ROSENBLATT FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £28.59k £27.63k £26.17k £30.23k £28.08k
Total expenditure £87.52k £102.20k £94.17k £78.81k £216.40k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 04 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024

(These accounts
have been qualified)

04 February 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2023 28 March 2024 52 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 28 March 2024 52 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2022 01 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 01 February 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2021 04 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 04 February 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 04 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 04 February 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Flat 16
Caenwood Court
Hampstead Lane
London
N6 4RU
Phone:
07711005151
Website:

No information available