Financial history THE FRIENDS OF ST BEDES SCHOOL, REDHILL

Charity Number: 283021
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £955 £316 £627 £1.48k £3.53k
Total expenditure £435 £123 £1.71k £3.34k £1.97k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A