Governing document AFRICA NOW
Charity number: 283024
Removed charity
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 28 APRIL 1981 AS AMENDED 25 SEPTEMBER 1996, 23 JULY 1999, 4 OCTOBER 2007, 9 OCTOBER 2008 AND 10 DECEMBER 2010.
Charitable objects
TO IMPROVE THE LIVELIHOODS AND DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES IN AFRICA IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY AND HELP MEET THEIR NEEDS AND PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
AFRICA
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.