Financial history SMEATHARPE VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 283034
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £3.54k £19.64k £11.82k £1.96k £2.91k
Total expenditure £3.10k £3.15k £5.85k £6.30k £3.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £19.43k £11.51k N/A N/A