Trustees SMEATHARPE VILLAGE HALL
Charity Number: 283034

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SALMON GRAHAM | Chair | 30 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
Tilla Brading | Trustee | 16 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Laura Barker - Baul | Trustee | 29 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
DAVID BUNNEY | Trustee | 27 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA KNOWLES | Trustee | 17 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dorothy Feehan | Trustee | 20 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Graham George Long | Trustee | 11 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Tyrone Gunter | Trustee | 11 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Carol Long | Trustee | 11 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
ELAINE RAVENCROFT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ARTHUR JOHN CORNISH | Trustee |
|
||||||
TRISTAN PIKE | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.