Financial history COUNTRY BUILDINGS PROTECTION TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 283059
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £51.92k £61.57k £40.05k £22.01k £62.01k
Total expenditure £61.39k £46.98k £41.30k £41.35k £56.16k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A N/A