Financial history THE WORSHIPFUL COMPANY OF CUTLERS GENERAL CHARITABLE FUND

Charity number: 283096
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £162.73k £143.21k £158.69k £145.09k £433.37k
Total expenditure £165.10k £133.03k £99.24k £135.54k £160.79k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A